Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 5, 2022
Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Fiscal Note February 15, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 3, 2022