Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 5, 2022
Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note February 18, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022