|
05/27/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/10/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
|
|
|