Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Fiscal Note March 7, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022