Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 13, 2022
Fiscal Note May 4, 2022
Fiscal Note March 15, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022