05/06/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/28/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/28/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |