06/03/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
05/18/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/18/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 05/06/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |