06/03/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
05/16/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/16/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/11/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/06/2022 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/29/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |