Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB213 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 22, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022