|
05/27/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
|
|
|