Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 11, 2022
Fiscal Note May 10, 2022
Fiscal Note May 4, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 7, 2022