Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB238 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 5, 2022
Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note May 2, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2022
Bill May 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022