03/17/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
03/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |