LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1008
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1008
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1008
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note
February 10, 2023
Bill
January 9, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 20, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 17, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 15, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 27, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 26, 2023
Compare