Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1009 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/21/2023

                    Page 1 
March 20, 2023  HB 23-1009  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated January 13, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0167  
Rep. Lindsay 
Sen. Moreno 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 20, 2023 
Senate Education 
Aaron Carpenter | 303-866-4918 
aaron.carpenter@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SECONDARY SCHOOL STUDENT SUBSTANCE USE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ School District 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Secondary School Student Substance Use Committee to identify 
practices that identify substance abuse in secondary schools and connect students to 
resources.  In FY 2023-24 only, the bill increases state expenditures.  In future years, 
the bill may increase state and school district expenditures.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $49,950 to the 
Department of Education.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill.  The bill was recommended by 
the Colorado Youth Advisory Council Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1009 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 
 
-       -       
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$49,950  	-       
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$4,495  	-       
 	Total Expenditures 	$54,445  	-       
 	Total FTE 	0.2 FTE 	-       
Transfers  	-       -       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$7,493        -       
 
 
 
 
    Page 2 
March 20, 2023  HB 23-1009  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Secondary School Student Substance Use Committee in the Colorado Department 
of Education (CDE) to develop, identify, or modify practices that identify students in secondary 
school who need substance use treatment, offer brief interventions, and refer students to substance 
use treatment resources.  Committee appointments must be made by September 1, 2023.  By 
January 5, 2024, the committee must submit a report to the CDE and every school district, and publish 
the report online.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CDE by $54,445 in FY 2023-24 only from the General Fund.  In 
future fiscal years, expenditures may increase in the Behavioral Health Administration (BHA) and the 
Department of Health Care Policy and Financing (HCPF). Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and 
detailed below.  
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1009 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Education   
Personal Services 	$24,450  	-       
Contractor 	$24,000  	-       
Streaming Services 	$1,500  	-       
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$4,495  	-       
Total Cost $54,445  	-       
Total FTE 0.2 FTE 	-       
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Department of Education.  In FY 2023-24 only, expenditures in the CDE will increase to hire staff, 
contract with a vendor, and provide streaming services, as described below. 
  
 Staffing costs.  The CDE requires 0.2 FTE to prepare a vendor contract, assemble the committee, 
draft communications, and review and edit the final draft from the vendor.  Staffing costs are 
prorated for the General Fund pay date shift. 
 
 Contract services. The CDE will contract with a vendor to prepare and plan meetings, facilitate 
meetings, provide research for existing practices, and to produce the report. The fiscal note 
assumes that there will be 160 hours of work at a cost of $150 per hour. 
 
 Streaming services. The CDE will have costs to stream each committee meeting.  Costs to stream 
committee meetings are estimated at $75 per hour for 20 hours of meetings. 
  Page 3 
March 20, 2023  HB 23-1009  
 
 
Behavioral Health Administration.  Starting in FY 2024-25, to the extent the committee’s 
recommendations results in more students seeking services from the BHA, expenditures in the 
administration will increase. The fiscal note assumes that any increase in appropriations will be 
requested through the annual budget process.  
 
Health Care Policy and Financing.  Starting in FY 2024-25, to the extent the committee’s 
recommendations results in more students seeking services from HCPF, expenditures will increase.  
The fiscal note assumes that any increase in appropriations will be requested through the annual 
budget process.   
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
School District  
In FY 2023-24, workload to certain school districts will increase if district staff participate on the newly 
created committee.  In addition, if a school district chooses to adopt any of the recommendations 
provided by the committee, expenditures may increase to implement the recommendations.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $49,950 from the General Fund to 
the Department of Education, and 0.2 FTE.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Behavioral Health Administration  Education      Human Services  
Information Technology School Districts 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.