Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note January 16, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023