Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note January 30, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023