Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note January 16, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 13, 2023

Amended

Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023