04/25/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
04/21/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/03/2023 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |