Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1025 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note January 12, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023