|
05/18/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|