Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note January 12, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023