Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1042 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/20/2023

                    Page 1 
June 20, 2023  HB 23-1042  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0509  
Rep. Bacon; Sharbini 
Sen. Gonzales  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 20, 2023 
Signed into Law  
Aaron Carpenter | 303-866-4918 
aaron.carpenter@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: ADMISSIBILITY STANDARDS FOR JUV ENILE STATEMENTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill makes juvenile statements inadmissible in court if law enforcement 
communicates untruthful information during interrogation; requires law enforcement to 
record all interrogations of juveniles; and requires the POST Board to train law 
enforcement officers on interrogating juveniles.  The bill will increase state 
expenditures in FY 2023-24 only, and will impact state and local workload on an 
ongoing basis. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $37,500 to the 
Department of Law.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1042 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue  	-       	-       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$37,500        	-       
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts  	-       	-       
 
 
 
    Page 2 
June 20, 2023  HB 23-1042  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Untruthful information in juvenile custodial interrogation.  The bill makes any statement or 
admission of a juvenile presumptively inadmissible in court if a law enforcement official knowingly 
uses untruthful information or belief, as defined in the bill, prior to or during the custodial 
interrogation, unless the prosecution can prove that the statement was made voluntarily despite the 
deception.  
 
Interrogation recording and model policy.  Law enforcement must electronically record all juvenile 
custodial integrations regardless of the nature of the offense, and are encouraged to adopt and follow 
national model policies concerning interrogations involving a juvenile. 
 
Law enforcement training.  The bill requires the Peace Officers Standards and Training Board (POST 
Board) to develop a live virtual training program on: 
 
 juvenile development and culture and its impact on interviews and custodial interrogations; 
 interpreting juvenile behavior during an interview or custodial interrogation; 
 techniques for building rapport with juveniles; 
 alternative communication methods for juveniles with intellectual and developmental disabilities; 
 constructing age-appropriate statements and questions; and 
 cautions and considerations for interviewing and interrogation juveniles in custody. 
 
The bill requires the state to provide the training on at least ten different dates prior to 
February 28, 2024, and to cover any reasonable direct local law enforcement agency cost associated 
with the training.  
Background 
House Bill 16-1117 required a peace officer investigating an alleged class 1 or 2 felony or a felony 
sexual assault to electronically record an interrogation occurring in a detention facility. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state cash fund expenditures in the Department of Law by $30,000 in FY 2023-24 
only.  In addition, starting in FY 2023-24, workload to the Judicial Department and state agencies that 
employ peace officers will be impacted as described below. 
 
Department of Law. The bill increases expenditures in the Department of Law from the POST Cash 
Fund by $37,500 in FY 2023-24 only to contract with a vendor to develop training curriculum and an 
instructor to teach classes.  Developing the training curriculum is estimated to take 500 hours at a rate 
of $75 per hour.  The fiscal note assumes all classes will be virtual resulting in no cost to the state for 
reimbursing direct costs and providing training materials and that the classes can be conducted with 
existing department trainers.  
 
   Page 3 
June 20, 2023  HB 23-1042  
 
 
Judicial Department.  Trial court workload will increase to the extent that prosecutors request more 
hearings to determine if a statement may be admitted despite the use of deception.  However, court 
workload may decrease to the extent less evidence is put in front of the court.  Overall, any changes 
in workload are not expected to require a change in appropriations. 
 
State law enforcement.  Workload will increase for state agencies that employ peace officers to 
coordinate training attendance.  No change in appropriations is required for any state agency. 
Local Government  
Local law enforcement agencies.  Workload to local law enforcement agencies may increase to update 
policies on when to record interrogations.  Because law enforcement agencies are already required to 
record certain interrogations, the fiscal note assumes that law enforcement agencies already have the 
necessary equipment to comply with the bill.  Law enforcement agencies will also have an increase in 
workload to facilitate scheduling. 
 
District attorneys.  Workload and costs to district attorney offices will increase to the extent there are 
additional or longer hearings to admit evidence. However, workload may decrease to the extent less 
evidence is put in front of the court and cases do not last as long.  Similar to the state, this impact is 
expected to be minimal. 
Technical Note 
Timeline feasibility.  Assuming a request for proposal solicitation requires six months to complete, 
the department will not be able to meet the required deadline of holding 10 trainings by 
February 28, 2024.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on May 18, 2023, and takes effect on August 7, 2023, 
assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes a $37,500 appropriation from the POST Board Cash Fund 
to the Department of Law. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Corrections  District Attorneys  Human Services 
Information Technology Judicial  Law 
Public Safety 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.