|
03/10/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
03/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|