Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1045 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 20, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill January 31, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 3, 2023

Amended

Bill February 22, 2023