05/15/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |