Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 3, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023