03/03/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
03/01/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/08/2023 - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |