LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1071
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1071
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1071
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
July 10, 2023
Fiscal Note
February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note
January 30, 2023
Bill
January 19, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 9, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 1, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 23, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 22, 2023
Compare