05/16/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/15/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/11/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |