Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note January 30, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Amended

Bill April 20, 2023