|
05/25/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2023
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
|
05/04/2023
|
First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|