Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 13, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023