Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note February 10, 2023
Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023

Amended

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023