Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note February 15, 2023
Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 14, 2023

Amended

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023