Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1139 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-First Regular Session
2-Seventy-fourth General Assembly
3-STATE OF COLORADO
4-REREVISED
5-This Version Includes All Amendments
6-Adopted in the Second House
7-LLS NO. 23-0753.01 Alison Killen x4350
81 HOUSE BILL 23-1139
9-House Committees Senate Committees
10-Transportation, Housing & Local Government Local Government & Housing
11-A BILL FOR AN ACT
2+BY REPRESENTATIVE(S) Martinez, Duran, English, Lukens, Mabrey,
3+Marshall, Mauro, Ortiz, Pugliese, Ricks, Snyder, Taggart, Velasco,
4+McCluskie, Bacon, Lindsay, Parenti;
5+also SENATOR(S) Simpson, Pelton R.
126 C
13-ONCERNING THE MODIFICATION OF THE SALARY CATEGORIZATION OF101
14-LOCALLY ELECTED OFFICERS IN SPECIFIED COUNTIES .102
15-Bill Summary
16-(Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
17-not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
18-passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
19-applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
20-http://leg.colorado.gov
21-.)
22-Current law categorizes each county for purposes of establishing
23-the salaries of elected officials in the county. The statutory salary amounts
24-are adjusted every 2 years for inflation and take effect for terms
25-commencing after any change is made. The bill modifies the categories
26-of 4 counties with the accompanying percentage increase in salary as
27-follows:
28-SENATE
29-3rd Reading Unamended
30-March 10, 2023
31-SENATE
32-Amended 2nd Reading
33-March 9, 2023
34-HOUSE
35-3rd Reading Unamended
36-February 24, 2023
37-HOUSE
38-Amended 2nd Reading
39-February 23, 2023
40-HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
41-Martinez, Duran, English, Lukens, Mabrey, Marshall, Mauro, McCluskie, Ortiz, Pugliese,
42-Ricks, Snyder, Taggart, Velasco
43-SENATE SPONSORSHIP
44-Simpson, Pelton R.
45-Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
46-Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
47-Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Archuleta county changes from category III-B to category
48-III-A (8% increase);
49-! Delta county changes from category III-B to category III-A
50-(8% increase);
51-! Saguache county changes from category V-B to category
52-V-A (8% increase); and
53-! Summit county changes from category II-A to category I-A
54-(18.5% increase for commissioners, treasurers, assessors,
55-and clerks; 22.2% increase for surveyors; 23.5% increase
56-for sheriffs; 65.5% increase for coroners).
57-Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
58-SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 30-2-102, amend2
59-(1.5)(a)(I)(A), (1.5)(a)(II), (1.5)(a)(III), (1.5)(a)(IV)(A), (1.5)(a)(V)(A),3
60-and (1.5)(a)(V)(B) as follows:4
61-30-2-102. Categorization of counties for fixing salaries of5
62-county officers - salary amounts - legislative declaration. (1.5) (a) For6
63-the purpose of establishing the salaries of county officers whose terms of7
64-office begin on or after January 1, 2016:8
65-(I) (A) Category I-A counties consist of the counties of Adams,9
66-Arapahoe, Boulder, Douglas, EAGLE, El Paso, Jefferson, Larimer, Pueblo,10
7+ONCERNING THE MODIFICATION OF THE SALARY CATEGORIZATION OF
8+LOCALLY ELECTED OFFICERS IN SPECIFIED COUNTIES
9+.
10+Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:
11+SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 30-2-102, amend
12+(1.5)(a)(I)(A), (1.5)(a)(II), (1.5)(a)(III), (1.5)(a)(IV)(A), (1.5)(a)(V)(A), and
13+(1.5)(a)(V)(B) as follows:
14+30-2-102. Categorization of counties for fixing salaries of county
15+officers - salary amounts - legislative declaration. (1.5) (a) For the
16+purpose of establishing the salaries of county officers whose terms of office
17+begin on or after January 1, 2016:
18+(I) (A) Category I-A counties consist of the counties of Adams,
19+Arapahoe, Boulder, Douglas, E
20+AGLE, El Paso, Jefferson, Larimer, Pueblo,
6721 R
68-OUTT,
69- SUMMIT, and Weld;11
70-(II) (A) Category II-A counties consist of the counties of Eagle,12
71-Garfield, GRAND, AND La Plata; Routt, and Summit;13
72-(B) CATEGORY II-B COUNTIES CONSIST OF THE COUNTY OF PITKIN;14
73-(B) (C) Category II-C counties consist of the counties of Fremont15
74-and Pitkin COUNTY OF FREMONT.16
75-(III) (A) Category III-A counties consist of the counties of17
22+OUTT, SUMMIT, and Weld;
23+NOTE: This bill has been prepared for the signatures of the appropriate legislative
24+officers and the Governor. To determine whether the Governor has signed the bill
25+or taken other action on it, please consult the legislative status sheet, the legislative
26+history, or the Session Laws.
27+________
28+Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material added to existing law; dashes
29+through words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law and such material is not part of
30+the act. (II) (A) Category II-A counties consist of the counties of Eagle,
31+Garfield, GRAND, AND La Plata; Routt, and Summit;
32+(B) CATEGORY II-B COUNTIES CONSIST OF THE COUNTY OF PITKIN;
33+(B) (C) Category II-C counties consist of the counties of Fremont
34+and Pitkin COUNTY OF FREMONT.
35+(III) (A) Category III-A counties consist of the counties of
7636 A
77-RCHULETA, Chaffee, Clear Creek, DELTA, Gunnison, Moffat,18
37+RCHULETA, Chaffee, Clear Creek, DELTA, Gunnison, Moffat,
7838 M
79-ONTEZUMA,
80- Montrose, Morgan, OURAY, Park, Rio Blanco, San Miguel,19
81-and Teller;20
82-1139-2- (B) Category III-B counties consist of the counties of Alamosa,1
83-Archuleta, Delta, Gilpin, Grand, and Logan;2
84-(C) Category III-C counties consist of the county COUNTIES of3
85-LAS ANIMAS AND Otero;4
86-(D) Category III-D counties consist of the counties of Las Animas5
87-and Montezuma.6
88-(IV) (A) Category IV-A counties consist of the counties of Custer,7
89-Elbert, Ouray, and Prowers;8
90-(V) (A) Category V-A counties consist of the counties of Baca,9
39+ONTEZUMA, Montrose, Morgan, OURAY, Park, Rio Blanco, San Miguel,
40+and Teller;
41+(B) Category III-B counties consist of the counties of Alamosa,
42+Archuleta, Delta,
43+ Gilpin, Grand, and Logan;
44+(C) Category III-C counties consist of the county COUNTIES of LAS
45+ANIMAS AND Otero;
46+(D) Category III-D counties consist of the counties of Las Animas
47+and Montezuma.
48+(IV) (A) Category IV-A counties consist of the counties of Custer,
49+Elbert, Ouray, and Prowers;
50+(V) (A) Category V-A counties consist of the counties of Baca,
9151 Conejos, Costilla, Lincoln, Mineral, Phillips, S
92-AGUACHE, and San Juan;10
52+AGUACHE, and San Juan;
9353 (B) Category V-B counties consist of the counties of Crowley
94-AND11
54+AND
9555 Hinsdale; and Saguache;
96-12
97-SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act13
98-takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the14
99-ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except15
100-that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V16
101-of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this17
102-act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take18
103-effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in19
104-November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the20
105-official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.21
106-1139
107--3-
56+SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act
57+takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the
58+ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except
59+that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V
60+of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this act
61+within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take effect
62+unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in
63+PAGE 2-HOUSE BILL 23-1139 November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the official
64+declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.
65+____________________________ ____________________________
66+Julie McCluskie Steve Fenberg
67+SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE PRESIDENT OF
68+OF REPRESENTATIVES THE SENATE
69+____________________________ ____________________________
70+Robin Jones Cindi L. Markwell
71+CHIEF CLERK OF THE HOUSE SECRETARY OF
72+OF REPRESENTATIVES THE SENATE
73+ APPROVED________________________________________
74+ (Date and Time)
75+ _________________________________________
76+ Jared S. Polis
77+ GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
78+PAGE 3-HOUSE BILL 23-1139