Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 7, 2023
Fiscal Note March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note February 22, 2023
Bill February 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023