|
06/06/2023
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2023 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2023 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2023 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|