Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 22, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023