Senate | 04/20/2023 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |