LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1206
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1206
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1206
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 10, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 2, 2023
Bill
February 17, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 24, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 23, 2023
Compare