|
05/22/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2023
|
Senate Considered House Adherence - Result was to Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Adhere
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
|
|
|