Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1210 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2023

Amended

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023