Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 7, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023