Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023