05/15/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |