Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 27, 2023
Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Amended

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 29, 2023