06/07/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/05/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |