Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Amended

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023