Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023